# MCQs For NCERT Class 4 Mathematics Multiplication

Please refer to the MCQ Questions for Class 4 Mathematics Multiplication with Answers. The following Multiplication Class 4 Mathematics MCQ Questions have been designed based on the current academic year syllabus and examination guidelines for Class 4. Our faculty has designed MCQ Questions for Class 4 Mathematics with Answers for all chapters as per your NCERT Class 4 Mathematics book.

## Multiplication Class 4 MCQ Questions with Answers

Please see below Multiplication Class 4 Mathematics MCQ Questions, solve the questions and compare your answers with the solutions provided below.

Question. 543 x 10 = ?
(a) 5430
(b) 5400
(c) 543
(d) 54300

A

Question. Find out the missing number:

(a) 81 81
(b) 45
(c) 15
(d) 27

B

Question. 25 x 25 = ?
(a) 325
(b) 425
(c) 525
(d) 625

D

Question. 28 x 50
(a) 140
(b) 1440
(c) 1400
(d) 1140

C

Question. Match the following:

(a) 1 3 4 2
(b) 2 4 3 1
(c) 3 2 4 1
(d) 2 3 4 1

D

Question. Fill in the blanks:

(a) 45, 20, 10
(b) 45, 40, 30
(c) 45, 0, 10
(d) 45, 5, 10

A

Question. Pick the odd one out: 5, 10, 15, 20, 24.
(a) 5
(b) 15
(c) 20
(d) 24

D

Question. Fill in the blanks.

(a) 73, 24, 20000
(b) 6, 12, 20
(c) 72, 240, 17280
(d) 2, 3, 4

C

Question. Which digit should come in place of , so that following multiplication becomes correct?

(a) 5
(b) 8
(c) 6
(d) 9

D

Question. _________ x 5 = 50
(a) 5
(b) 10
(c) 15
(d) 20

B

Question. Find the missing number:

(a) 50 1000
(b) 1000
(c) 125
(d) 2500

A

Question. Pick the odd one out: 11, 22, 32, 44, 55.
(a) 11
(b) 22
(c) 32
(d) 44

C

Question. When 78456 is multiplied by A, we get 2510592. Find the value of A.
(a) 28
(b) 30
(c) 32
(d) 34

C

Question. 11 x 11 = ?
(a) 111
(b) 121
(c) 131
(d) 141

B

Question. Multiply using box multiplication method.
(a) 15145
(b) 15115
(c) 15445
(d) 15454

A

Question. 7899 x 1 = ?
(a) 7900
(b) 7899
(c) 7898
(d) 7890

B

Question. Match the following:

A B C D E
(a) 2 3 1 5 4
(b) 1 2 3 4 5
(c) 2 1 3 4 5
(d) 1 2 3 5 4

A

Question. 500 x 0 = ?
(a) 0
(b) 50
(c) 500
(d) 5000

A

Question. 22 x 5 = ?
(a) 100
(b) 105
(c) 110
(d) 115

C

Question. 500 x 400 = ?
(a) 200
(b) 2000
(c) 20000
(d) 200000

D

Question. Join the dots by multiplying the numbers & find out the last number. See what image appears.

(a) 5210
(b) 5120
(c) 2150
(d) 4500

B

Question. _________ x 12 = 96
(a) 3
(b) 5
(c) 8
(d) 9

C

Question. 966 x 20
(a) 19320
(b) 1932
(c) 1930
(d) 19300

A

Question. 9 x 400 = ?
(a) 36
(b) 360
(c) 3600
(d) 36000

C

Question. 43 x 0 = ?
(a) 43
(b) 0
(c) 44
(d) 42

B

Question. 65 x 64 = ?
(a) 4160
(b) 4225
(c) 4165
(d) 4260

A

Question. Solve the problem.

(a) 6 x 13 = 70
(b) 6 x 13 = 78
(c) 6 x 13 = 72
(d) 6 x 13 = 79

B

Question. Multiplication is the short form of repeated _________.
(a) Multiplication
(b) Division
(d) Subtraction

C

Question. The length of a square field is 480 m. Vishal runs 5 rounds around the field. Find the total distance ran by Vishal.
(a) 2400 m
(b) 960 m
(c) 9600 m
(d) 4800 m